Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements for golf carts in St. Mary's County; authorizing the St. Mary's County Board of Commissioners to designate county highways that have a speed limit not greater than 35 miles per hour as highways on which a person may operate a golf cart; authorizing a person who operates a golf cart on a designated highway to only operate the golf cart with certain lighting devices, between dawn and dusk, and while staying as far right on the roadway as possible; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0863 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page