Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Title IX - Notice (Hear Our Voices Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis, Bartlett, Boyce, Cardin, Cullison, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Henson, Hill, Howell, Jalisi, R. Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Landis, Lehman, Lierman, Love, Luedtke, McComas, McIntosh, Proctor, Qi, Reznik, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each public school to inform students, faculty, staff, and parents regarding who serves as the Title IX coordinator for the school, the process for filing a sexual misconduct compliant, and the support measures that are in place for filing a sexual misconduct complaint and how to access the support measures.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0887
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1536 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483121/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education – Title IX – Policies and Procedures (Hear Our Voices Act of 2022)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {483121/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Education - Title IX - Notice (Hear Our Voices Act of 2022)
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-450 )
Last Updated: 3/28/2022 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page