Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Employees – Whistleblower Protections – Civil Actions
Sponsored by
Delegates Ivey and Charles
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a prerequisite that a certain public school employee shall exhaust administrative remedies before instituting a certain civil action; authorizing a public school employee who is subject to a certain personnel action to file an administrative complaint with a public school employer; requiring a public school employer to provide an administrative remedial process; requiring certain public school employees to give prior notice to the local superintendent of schools about instituting a civil action; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1254 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public School Employees – Whistleblower Protections – Civil Actions
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {903428/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public School Employees – Whistleblower Protections – Civil Actions
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Hough) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Text - Chapter - Public School Employees – Whistleblower Protections – Civil Actions
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page