Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - School Board Nominating Commission - Vacancy Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegate Forbes
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore County School Board Nominating Commission to hold a public hearing on the selection of a nominee for a single vacancy on the Baltimore County Board of Education in a certain manner under certain circumstances; requiring the Commission to make publicly available on its website live video streaming of certain public hearings and certain archived video recordings; authorizing the Commission to retain and reactivate the applications of certain candidates for certain vacancies on the county board; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514036/1
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514036/1 (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County - School Board Nominating Commission - Vacancy Procedures
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore County - School Board Nominating Commission - Vacancy Procedures
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {514036/1 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Lam) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {514036/1 (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/23/2021 11:19 AM
Click to return on the top page