Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Teacher Certification - Montessori Schools
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making an individual eligible for a certificate to teach students in a Montessori school if the individual meets certain requirements; authorizing the State Board of Education to require an individual to successfully pass an examination to be certified under the Act; providing that an individual who satisfies the requirements under the Act may not be required to meet any additional requirements to be certified to teach students in a Montessori school; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1344 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Teacher Certification - Montessori Schools
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Teacher Certification - Montessori Schools
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Teacher Certification - Montessori Schools
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Education - Teacher Certification - Montessori Schools
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Teacher Certification - Montessori Schools
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Text - Chapter - Education - Teacher Certification - Montessori Schools
(   6-127 )
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:29 AM
Click to return on the top page