Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing, from one to two, the maximum number of apprentices that certain licensed cosmetologists may directly train and supervise; and requiring the State Board of Cosmetologists in the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt regulations consistent with the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Cosmetology - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263020/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - State Board of Cosmetology - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {263020/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Text - Chapter - State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 2:02 PM
Click to return on the top page