Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $200,000 to $500,000 beginning in fiscal year 2024, the amount of an appropriation that the Governor is required to provide in the annual budget bill for the CASH Campaign of Maryland.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0797
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-28)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2022 2/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
House 3/04/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (102-28) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Text - Chapter - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page