Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Funding Formulas - Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the appropriation in the annual budget for the purpose of providing grants to pay the capital costs of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority to equal at least the amount appropriated in fiscal year 2026; requiring, subject to a certain contingency, that a certain mandated appropriation be increased by 3% each year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0463
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2022
Legislative Date
1/30/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203626/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Arikan) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-35)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Augustine) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {823520/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (34-12)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Metzgar)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Funding Formulas - Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
House 1/30/2022 1/30/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {203626/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Arikan) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Funding Formulas - Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (102-35) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Augustine) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Floor Amendment {823520/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (34-12) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Metzgar) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page