Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, an insurer that uses credit information to provide, on request, certain exceptions to the insurer's rates, ratings classifications, company or tier placement, or underwriting rules or guidelines to certain applicants and insureds whose credit information has been influenced by certain events; requiring an insurer, within 30 days after receipt of documentation of a certain event, to inform the applicant of the outcome of a request for a reasonable exception; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {583827/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-40)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History Rating Policy
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {583827/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History Rating Policy
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-40) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Finance 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/29/2022 6:07 PM
Click to return on the top page