Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Telehealth – Health Care Practitioners and the Maryland Medical Assistance Program
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to a certain limitation, to provide health care services appropriately delivered through telehealth, including services provided using an audio-only call; altering a certain provision of law requiring the Program to provide certain mental health services to include the use of an audio-only call; providing that certain regulations may not prohibit a health care provider from using audio-only calls to provide certain services; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health – Telehealth – Health Care Practitioners and the Maryland Medical Assistance Program
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:37 PM
Click to return on the top page