Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – More Jobs for Marylanders Program – Extension and Alterations
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Anderton, Boteler, Buckel, Chisholm, Ghrist, Griffith, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Mangione, McComas, McKay, Munoz, Novotny, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Thiam, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which and the period of time for which the Department of Commerce may provide a qualified business entity a certificate certifying that an eligible project is enrolled in the More Jobs for Marylanders Program; and requiring the Comptroller to transfer, from the More Jobs for Marylanders Tax Credit Reserve Fund to the General Fund, an amount equal to the amount stated in the final tax credit certificate issued, rather than that stated in the initial tax credit certificate.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0391
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Economic Development – More Jobs for Marylanders Program – Extension and Alterations
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/18/2022 10:42 AM
Click to return on the top page