Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate D.M. Davis
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Transportation promptly to undertake all steps necessary to complete the design, engineering, and National Environmental Policy Act process and secure a record of decision for the Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project; requiring the Governor in each of fiscal years 2023 through 2027, to include in the annual State budget an appropriation from the Transportation Trust Fund of at least $5,000,000 contingent on the receipt of certain federal funds for certain purposes related to the Project; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0081
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0205 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project – Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134664/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-37)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Text - First - Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project – Funding
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {134664/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (98-37) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page