Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization – Extension of Provider Fee
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration),
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the stabilization of the individual health insurance market by extending to calendar year 2028 the assessment of a health insurance provider fee; exempting stand-alone vision and dental plan carriers that are subject to the health insurance provider fee assessment from the health care regulatory assessment fee and annual assessment fee in certain years; and providing that funds from the distribution of the health insurance provider fee assessment can be used only for certain purposes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0395
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {703523/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (42-92)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization – Extension of Provider Fee
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {533820/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Floor Amendment {703523/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (42-92) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization – Extension of Provider Fee
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Finance 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization – Extension of Provider Fee
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page