Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation – Home Improvement Contracts – Payments
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from one-third to one-half the maximum portion of a home improvement contract price that a person may receive as a deposit before or at the time of execution of a home improvement contract; and prohibiting a person from receiving any remaining amount of a home improvement contract price until the completion of the home improvement specified in the contract.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/22/2020
Legislative Date
7/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation – Home Improvement Contracts – Payments
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/22/2020 7/22/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Business Regulation – Home Improvement Contracts – Payments
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:36 PM
Click to return on the top page