Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children in Out–of–Home Placements – Placement in Medical Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegate Reznik
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a court may commit a child for inpatient care and treatment in a psychiatric facility; establishing requirements and procedures for the placement certain children in medical facilities; requiring the Maryland Department of Health or the Department of Human Services to provide beds and ensure placement for certain children and to be subject to certain remedies for failure to provide beds; establishing the Foster Child Support Fund to provide resources and support for children in out-of-home placements; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1382 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, October 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Children in Out–of–Home Placements – Placement in Medical Facilities
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {183922/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Children in Out–of–Home Placements – Placement in Medical Facilities
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation Judicial Proceedings 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
(   5-533.1 )
Last Updated: 4/6/2022 7:53 PM
Click to return on the top page