Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Time Off for Employee Voting
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring every employer in the State to allow any employee who does not have 2 hours of continuous off-duty time when the polls are open up to 2 hours absence from work to vote in an election; altering the requirement that certain employees furnish to their employers certain proof the employee has voted to specify that the proof be furnished in a timely manner; and prohibiting an employer from discriminating, retaliating, or taking any form of reprisal against an employee who is absent from work to vote.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0158
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1589 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Time Off for Employee Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {655867/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law – Time Off for Employee Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-38)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law – Time Off for Employee Voting
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {655867/1 Adopted 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law – Time Off for Employee Voting
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (91-38) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:35 PM
Click to return on the top page