Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - State Song - Repeal and Competition
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the State song; requiring the Maryland State Arts Council to develop a plan for and conduct a certain State song competition, including the acceptance of certain entries to the competition, and to carry out certain tasks relating to the competition; requiring the Council to report certain finalists of the competition to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021; authorizing the Council to make certain recommendations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0087
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - State Song - Repeal and Competition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - General Provisions - State Song - Repeal and Competition
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:35 PM
Click to return on the top page