Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pesticide Regulation - Transfer to Department of the Environment
Sponsored by
Delegates Ruth, Boyce, Foley, D. Jones, and Lehman
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring the regulation of pesticides, plant diseases, and mosquitos in the State from the Department of Agriculture to the Department of the Environment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0268
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pesticide Regulation - Transfer to Department of the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Pesticide Regulation - Transfer to Department of the Environment
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   18-101, 18-101 through 18-114, 18-103, 18-107, 18-109, 18-110, 18-111, 18-201 through 18-219, 18-204, 18-206, 18-217, 18-301, 18-301 through 18-305, 18-401 through 18-413, 18-405, 18-408, 18-412, 18-501 through 18-509, 18-508, 18-509 )
Last Updated: 3/5/2022 9:36 AM
Click to return on the top page