Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Feldmark, Forbes, Henson, R. Jones, Kaiser, Ruth, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program in the Maryland State Department of Education to license outdoor, nature-based early learning and child care programs in order to expand access to affordable, high-quality early learning programs and to investigate the benefits of outdoor, nature-based classrooms; requiring the Department to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2024, with its findings and recommendations for modifying or expanding the Pilot Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   9.5-1101 through 9.5-1106 )
Last Updated: 2/13/2022 7:21 PM
Click to return on the top page