Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program to provide temporary benefits to a covered individual who is taking leave from employment; establishing the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund; requiring, beginning January 1, 2022, certain employees, employers, and self-employed individuals to pay certain contributions; authorizing, beginning July 1, 2023, a covered individual taking certain leave from employment to submit a claim for benefits; authorizing the establishment of private employer plans; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0211
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2021
Legislative Date
1/28/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
House 1/28/2021 1/28/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
(   8.3-101 through 8.3-1001, 8-302   )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page