Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
Sponsored by
Delegate Moon
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition against a person using or possessing with intent to use drug paraphernalia to inject, ingest, inhale, or otherwise introduce into the human body a controlled dangerous substance; repealing the prohibition against a person delivering or selling, or manufacturing or possessing with intent to deliver or sell drug paraphernalia under certain circumstances; altering a prohibition against a person possessing or distributing controlled paraphernalia under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0420
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0720 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/16/2020
Legislative Date
6/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-39)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/16/2020 6/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (91-39) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page