Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Director of the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency to issue certain fraternal organizations a license for not more than five instant ticket lottery machines; providing that proceeds from instant ticket lottery machine sales by a fraternal organization are to be distributed in a certain manner; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency solicits proposals from multiple vendors for the lease or purchase of instant ticket lottery machines under the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page