Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mold Inspections and Remediation - Standards, Reporting, Penalties, and Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Henson, Bartlett, Boyce, Hill, Landis, Lehman, Patterson, Proctor, and Ruth
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, the Department of Housing and Community Development, and the Department of General Services, to adopt certain regulations on or before June 1, 2024, establishing uniform standards for mold assessment and remediation; authorizing a tenant to deposit the tenant's rent in an escrow account under certain circumstances; authorizing a tax credit for taxpayers of certain residential properties who incur mold remediation costs; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0320
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0129 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Mold Inspections and Remediation - Standards, Reporting, Penalties, and Tax Credit
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   6-1701, 6-1702 )
(   8-211.2 )
(   10-754 )
Last Updated: 3/17/2022 4:40 PM
Click to return on the top page