Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on the Membership and Operation of the Prince George's County Board of Education to study and make recommendations regarding implementation of an electoral process for an all-elected Board, appropriate compensation, and an appropriate phase-in period for changes to Board composition; altering the composition of the Board beginning July 1, 2024, by removing four appointed members; requiring the Board chair and vice chair be elected from among the members beginning December 5, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1107 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, July 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-2)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George's County - Workgroup on the Membership and Operation of the Prince George's County Board of Education PG 503-22
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {873323/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {493221/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-2) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Age
Last Updated: 5/6/2022 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page