Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 505-22
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, in Prince George's County, the nonschool use of public school facilities for public and community purposes, and the manner by which certain costs are apportioned, to be regulated by local law consistent with certain use criteria and not inconsistent with other provisions of law; authorizing a local law to provide for an interagency coordinating board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0253 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 505-22
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:15 PM
Click to return on the top page