Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County – Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice – Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, in Baltimore County, the county to work with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to identify properties in the 6th legislative district in Baltimore County that are being used as a residential properties, being rented by the owners of the properties, and are eligible for, but not receiving, a certain homestead property tax credit; requiring that the homeowner of certain properties be provided a certain notice; and terminating the Act on September 30, 2024.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/06/2020
Legislative Date
10/06/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/06/2020 10/06/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore County – Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice – Pilot Program
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page