Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Rental Properties and Mobile Home Parks - Security Deposits - Rate of Interest
Sponsored by
Delegates Novotny and Arentz
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of simple interest on security deposits held by a residential landlord or a mobile home park owner and owed to a residential tenant or mobile home park resident by repealing the requirement that interest be calculated at a rate of 1.5% per year if that percentage exceeds the U.S. Treasury yield curve rate.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Residential Rental Properties and Mobile Home Parks - Security Deposits - Rate of Interest
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:14 PM
Click to return on the top page