Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election – Absentee Ballot Canvass – Start and Release of Tabulation
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Attar, Bagnall, Bartlett, Belcastro, Crutchfield, C. Jackson, D. Jones, Johnson, Kerr, McKay, Moon, Ruth, Solomon, Terrasa, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the earliest day on which a local board of elections may open an envelope of an absentee ballot from the Wednesday after election day to 14 days before election day; altering a requirement for a local board to release an unofficial absentee ballot vote tabulation at the end of each day of canvassing to apply only on and after election day; prohibiting a person from releasing a partial or complete tabulation of absentee ballot votes before a certain time; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/02/2020
Legislative Date
9/02/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/02/2020 9/02/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Election – Absentee Ballot Canvass – Start and Release of Tabulation
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page