Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegate D. Jones
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, from 3 to 4 years after an offense was committed, the statute of limitations for certain prosecutions related to violations of State election laws; imposing certain restrictions related to candidacies, political committee positions, and elected offices if a certain civil penalty has not been paid; altering enforcement mechanisms related to violations of State campaign finance laws, including the amount of certain civil penalties and the manner for imposing certain penalties; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0015
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-35)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {623027/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (98-35) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 9:47 PM
Click to return on the top page