Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a merchant, in certain transactions, from prohibiting a person from making a cash payment to purchase goods and services, requiring a person to purchase goods or services by using a credit or debit card, or charging or collecting from a person a fee for making a cash payment for the purchase of goods or services; providing that a violation of the Act is an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act and subject to certain enforcement and penalty provisions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/15/2020
Legislative Date
9/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2021
Legislative Date
1/14/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/15/2020 9/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act)
House 1/14/2021 1/14/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page