Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Questioning of Minors by Police Officers
Sponsored by
Delegate Johnson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a police officer from questioning a certain minor unless an attorney for the minor is physically present with the minor or communicating with the minor through live, two-way electronic and audio communication.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/22/2020
Legislative Date
10/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Questioning of Minors by Police Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/22/2020 10/22/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Questioning of Minors by Police Officers
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page