Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Limitations on Summoning Law Enforcement or Emergency Services - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a landlord from using a lease or form of lease that contains a provision that limits a tenant's ability to summon, or penalizes a tenant or another individual solely for summoning, the assistance of law enforcement or emergency services; prohibiting a landlord from taking certain retaliatory actions because a tenant or another individual summons the assistance of law enforcement or emergency services for certain purposes; prohibiting a local jurisdiction from enacting certain laws; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1093 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {503627/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Real Property - Limitations on Summoning Law Enforcement or Emergency Services - Prohibition
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {503627/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Adams) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Limitations on Summoning Law Enforcement or Emergency Services - Prohibition
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:14 PM
Click to return on the top page