Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food and Beverage Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
Sponsored by
Delegate Gilchrist
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Green Purchasing Committee, in consultation with certain units of State government and other stakeholders, to develop, by January 1, 2023, a certain methodology for a unit to estimate greenhouse gas emissions of food and beverages procured, to establish a certain baseline measurement by January 1, 2024, and to consider the nutrition of individuals fully or partially dependent on the State for their diet when developing strategies; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0772 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/26/2020
Legislative Date
10/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {816880/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (40-85)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-41)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/26/2020 10/26/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food and Beverage Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {816880/1 Adopted 26AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted 26AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (40-85) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food and Beverage Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (90-41) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page