Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Class 3 Winery
Sponsored by
Washington County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Washington County to issue a Class D beer and wine license to holders of a Class 3 winery license that held Class 4 limited winery licenses prior to May 31, 2018 and produce less than 30,000 gallons annually; authorizing the holder of a certain Class D beer and wine license in the county to sell only wine the holder produces; and prohibiting the transfer of the license to another owner or for use at another premises.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Class 3 Winery
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Class 3 Winery
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 3/16/2022 4:51 PM
Click to return on the top page