Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Data - Race and Ethnicity Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk and R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain provision of law requiring the Maryland Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities to collaborate with the Maryland Health Care Commission to publish a report card that includes racial and ethnic composition data on individuals who hold a license or certificate issued by a health occupations board, rather than only physicians; requiring the Office, as permitted by certain privacy laws, to respond to requests for health data that includes race and ethnicity information within 30 days of receipt of the request; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0565
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/21/2020
Legislative Date
9/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Data - Race and Ethnicity Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Data - Race and Ethnicity Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-6)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/21/2020 9/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Data - Race and Ethnicity Information
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Data - Race and Ethnicity Information
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Third Reading Passed (128-6) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/23/2021 11:19 AM
Click to return on the top page