Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Presumption of Property Abandonment - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Kerr
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 648
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which certain property is presumed abandoned; altering the circumstances under which the running of the period of abandonment of certain property ceases; providing that the period of abandonment of certain property ceases under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0882 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {863228/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 648
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {553027/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Presumption of Property Abandonment - Revisions
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Finance 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {863228/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Financial Institutions - Presumption of Property Abandonment - Revisions
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 648
Text - Chapter - Financial Institutions - Presumption of Property Abandonment - Revisions
Last Updated: 6/16/2022 11:27 AM
Click to return on the top page