Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Gifts and Lobbyist Registration (Public Integrity Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the value of certain food or beverages, to no more than $50, that an official of the Legislative Branch or member of the General Assembly may accept; increasing the fee required to accompany a certain lobbyist registration form from $100 to $300; and requiring the Commission to reduce a certain fee that a nonprofit entity is required to pay under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/01/2020
Legislative Date
7/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/01/2020 7/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Ethics - Gifts and Lobbyist Registration (Public Integrity Act of 2021)
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page