Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsored by
Delegate Johnson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing in Harford County a resort complex license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue one resort complex license to a person owning, leasing, or operating a resort complex; specifying that the license authorizes the holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor at certain outlets in the resort complex; establishing the days and times during which a license holder may serve alcoholic beverages; exempting the resort complex license from a certain license quota or restriction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1272 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/23/2020
Legislative Date
10/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/23/2020 10/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page