Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "clinical nurse specialist" and "practice as a clinical nurse specialist" for the purpose of authorizing clinical nurse specialists to prescribe drugs and durable medical equipment under regulations adopted by the State Board of Nursing; altering the definition of "authorized prescriber" for purposes of the Maryland Pharmacy Act to include clinical nurse specialists; and authorizing a licensed physician to personally prepare and dispense a prescription written by a clinical nurse specialist.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0513
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority
House 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/2/2022 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page