Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation
Sponsored by
Delegate Henson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a congregate care facility to allow a patient's or resident's family member to visit the patient or resident under certain circumstances; requiring a congregate care facility to allow for an alternate means of communication with the patient or resident, such as audio or video calls, if the congregate care facility determines the presence of certain visitors presents a danger to the health and safety of patients, residents, or staff; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/26/2020
Legislative Date
10/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/26/2020 10/26/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page