Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Bartlett, Lierman, Bagnall, Chang, Crutchfield, Davis, W. Fisher, Henson, Lehman, Pena-Melnyk, Rogers, Ruth, Williams, Wilson, and Cardin
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement officer who takes a child into custody, interrogates a child, or charges a child with a criminal violation to provide reasonable notice to the child's parents, guardian, or custodian; requiring the notice to include the child's location, the reason for the custody action, and instructions on how to make in-person contact; prohibiting the interrogation of a child by a law enforcement officer until the child has consulted with a certain attorney and notice has been provided to certain individuals; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0053
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0315 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Griffith) Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {913328/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (44-90)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {723020/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (44-90)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-41)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
House 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {193124/1 Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Griffith) Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Floor Amendment {913328/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (44-90) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Floor Amendment {723020/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (44-90) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (91-41) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Referred Rules 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:12 PM
Click to return on the top page