Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Student Education Equity Grant Program - Established (Student Education Equity in Funding Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Student Education Equity Grant Program in the State Department of Education to provide grants to eligible students to attend an open public or nonpublic school approved to operate in the State; authorizing students whose assigned school is not open to apply to the Department for a grant to be used for expenses to attend an open school; requiring the Department to establish an application process, distribute grants, enter into certain agreements, provide certain information to students, and use certain funds; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/15/2020
Legislative Date
7/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/15/2020 7/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Student Education Equity Grant Program - Established (Student Education Equity in Funding Act)
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
(   5-222 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page