Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "sexual abuse"; altering the statute of limitations in certain civil actions relating to child sexual abuse by providing that a certain action may be filed at any time; providing for the retroactive application of the Act to revive any action that was barred by the application of the period of limitations applicable before October 1, 2021, if the action is filed before October 1, 2023; and repealing a statute of repose for certain civil actions relating to child sexual abuse.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0134
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0974 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/30/2020
Legislative Date
9/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/30/2020 9/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page