Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the contents of a certain report required by the Department of Human Services regarding children and foster youth in the State child welfare system; requiring the State Department of Education, on or before December 1 each year, to report to the General Assembly and Department of Human Services certain information regarding children and foster youth in the State child welfare system; requiring the Department of Education to publish each report on its website within 30 days after submission to the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0592
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0986 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/08/2020
Legislative Date
7/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {958174/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/08/2020 7/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Child Welfare System - Reporting
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {958174/1 Adopted 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Age
Last Updated: 5/18/2021 5:26 PM
Click to return on the top page