Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Feldmark, Ebersole, Chang, Terrasa, and Bagnall
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the University of Maryland, Baltimore to study the health effects of air traffic noise on communities near Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport since the implementation of the Next Generation Air Transportation System; requiring the study to evaluate health outcomes and certain costs; requiring the Governor to provide in the 2023 budget bill at least $100,000 for the study; requiring a report be submitted by September 1, 2023, to the Governor, the General Assembly, and certain county executives and councils; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0310 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page