Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Legionnaires' Disease Prevention Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, by October 1, 2022, to adopt regulations requiring an owner or operator of a public building to establish and implement a water management program to prevent the growth and spread of Legionella pneumophila in a building water system to reduce the risk for Legionnaires' disease.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0302
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Legionnaires' Disease Prevention Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Legionnaires' Disease Prevention Act
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-405.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2022 3:51 PM
Click to return on the top page