Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Sponsored by
Delegate Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding barriers to providing mental health services on campus, the use of telemedicine, video conferencing and hotlines, and implementation of counseling services; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report on or before December 1, 2021, and a final report on or before December 1, 2022, to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0161
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1504 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/23/2020
Legislative Date
10/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/23/2020 10/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page