Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County – Board of Education – Student Member Scholarship MC 05–22
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the scholarship award for a student member of the Montgomery County Board of Education who completes a full term on the county board to be equal, up to a certain limit, to the costs of annual tuition, mandatory fees, and room and board for a resident undergraduate student to attend the institution within the University System of Maryland, with certain exceptions, with the highest annual expenses for a full-time resident undergraduate during the academic year in which the student member serves on the county board.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-20)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Montgomery County – Board of Education – Student Member Scholarship MC 05–22
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {433725/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County – Board of Education – Student Member Scholarship MC 05–22
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (114-20) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County – Board of Education – Student Member Scholarship MC 05–22
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:05 PM
Click to return on the top page