Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish, by October 1, 2021, a stakeholder advisory group to develop a reading and dyslexia handbook to guide local school systems in the implementation of best practices for early literacy and dyslexia; requiring a completed handbook be made available to the public by June 1, 2022; requiring the identification of tools and materials to address the needs of at-risk and struggling students with dyslexia; requiring the Department to update the handbook every 3 years; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0126
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/24/2020
Legislative Date
9/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {175067/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/24/2020 9/24/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {175067/1 Adopted 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 4:06 PM
Click to return on the top page