Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the discovery or perception of, or belief about, another person's race, color, national origin, sex, gender identity, or sexual orientation, whether or not accurate, does not constitute legally adequate provocation to mitigate a killing from the crime of murder to manslaughter nor is it a defense to the crime of assault in any degree.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0046
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0488 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/04/2020
Legislative Date
8/04/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {202518/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/04/2020 8/04/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {202518/1 Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 10:29 AM
Click to return on the top page